judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES PARKER V COLUMBIA SECURITY LLC

Case Information: 11-CV-0441
Short Caption:CHARLES PARKER V COLUMBIA SECURITY LLCClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB2188-11Filed Date:03/30/2011

Opening Event Date:03/30/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/21/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles Parker NPro SeN
AppelleeColumbia Security LLCN
Stephen O. HesslerNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/30/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/27/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL and NON-APPEALABLE ORDER... (BY: ETW)
04/27/2011TMC - OTSC
05/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (20-pgs/tape 3/16/11 proc.)/wcd
05/18/2011RECORD INDEX
05/18/2011RECORD COPIES
06/29/2011 ORDERED that THIS APPEAL IS DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction as having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER. See DC Code 11-721 (2001). (BRNBKG)
06/29/2011DISMISSED
07/21/2011FiledMandate