judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-2704
B-2704
04/29/1971
Application for Writ of Error
HOME INDEMNITY COMPANY
CAMILIO MOSQUEDA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/01/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/07/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
04/29/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/01/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/17/1971Opinion issued
07/07/1971Document received (See Remarks)
07/07/1971Document received (See Remarks)
07/07/1971Document received (See Remarks)
05/07/1971Response to Petition
04/29/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/29/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Camilio MosquedaRespondent
HOME INDEMNITY COMPANYPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information