judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ETCHISON VS. DEAN ROOFING

Case Information: 38440
Short Caption:ETCHISON VS. DEAN ROOFINGCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0101655Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/28/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/07/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Floyd S. Etchison--Credit Union M.O. #714452571.
09/07/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-15103
09/25/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-16149
09/28/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. 01-16396
09/28/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/15/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "AFFIRM the judgment of the district court." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-19069
12/12/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal this day. 01-19658
12/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 2001. 01-19658