judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TRINITY UNIVERSAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. C.L. COOKE AND SONS

Case: B-2686
B-2686
04/19/1971
Application for Writ of Error
TRINITY UNIVERSAL INSURANCE COMPANY
C.L. COOKE AND SONS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/23/1971Post submission brief filedRespondent
07/13/1971Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
07/12/1971Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
05/25/1971Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/07/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
04/19/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/28/1971Opinion issued
07/23/1971Post submission brief filed
07/13/1971Supplemental Brief filed
07/12/1971Supplemental Brief filed
06/09/1971Document received (See Remarks)
05/25/1971Reply to Response
05/07/1971Response to Petition
04/19/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/19/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
C.L. Cooke and SonsRespondent
Trinity Universal Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information