judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VARO KEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0103)
Case Number:S-10-0103Case Docketed On:05/06/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:VARO KEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:VARO KEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantVaro KenPatricia Lynn Bennett
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Gregory A. Phillips
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 167
Citation:267 P.3d 567 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/06/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/06/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/06/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/21/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/23/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Patricia L. Bennett for appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
07/13/2010Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
07/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/15/2010Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel - Public Defender is granted leave to withdraw.OrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
07/30/2010Motion - Remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
07/30/2010Motion - Stay briefing - unopposedMotionStay briefing - unopposedFinal
07/30/2010Affidavit - OtherAffidavitOtherFinal
07/30/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion for Partial Remand for Evidentiary Hearing on Ineffective Assistance of Counsel, Affidavit of Patricia Bennett and Appellant's Motion to Stay Briefing ScheduleEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/24/2010Order - Remand - CaleneOrderRemand - CaleneFinal
09/28/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - District Court Pleading - Notice setting hearing for 11/1/10 regarding the issue of ineffective assistance of counsel.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
12/08/2010Event - Phone Call to District Court re remand. Will follow-up with Judge.EventPhone CallFinal
12/09/2010Event - Phone Call from District Court Clerk, findings have been made by Judge, copy forwarded to Supreme Court. Transcripts have not been filed yet.EventPhone CallFinal
12/10/2010Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Findings of fact and conclusions of law on Appellant Varo Ken's Claims of Ineffective Assistance of CounselRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesFindings of fact and conclusions of lawFinal
12/14/2010Event - Phone Call from District Court Clerk's office, transcripts from record are missing. Counsel has been contacted, but not replied. Clerk's office will keep us informed.EventPhone CallFinal
12/27/2010Event - Phone Call from District Court Clerk re record, transcripts from remand hearing have been filed, will notify CourtEventPhone CallFinal
01/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court after Calene hearingNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter - Resumption of briefing scheduleNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/23/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
04/07/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patricia Bennett for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/02/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcripts & Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/05/2011Event - Phone Call. Leda Pojman advised that Terry Armitage, Deputy Attorney General, will do oral argument.EventPhone CallFinal
05/25/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Patricia Lynn Bennett for appellant; Terry Armitage, Deputy Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/25/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/22/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Kite writing for the Court, Justice Golden filed a concurring in part and dissenting in part in which Justice Voigt joins; Justice Voigt filed a concurring in part and dissenting in part opinion in which Justice Golden joined.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/28/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for 12/27/2011 by agent for warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
01/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/10/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/10/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/10/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/12/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Mandate signed for by agent for Warden at WSP on 1/11/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
01/17/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/12/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal