judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BERALDO (FRANK) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 38461
Short Caption:BERALDO (FRANK) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 29466 , 43152 , 80722
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR960461Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/16/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/11/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/11/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-15322
09/14/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15547
12/19/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellant has failed to file either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested. Appellant shall file and serve the required document or show cause sanctions should not be imposed within 10 days from the date of this order. If appellant intends to cite to transcripts that were not prepared and filed in the district court prior to the docketing of this appeal, appellant should file and serve a transcript request form identifying the necessary transcripts. 01-21413
12/26/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Certificate Regarding Transcript w/attached request for transcript filed in district court on 9/7/01. 01-21704
01/07/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 8, 2002. 02-00395
02/08/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 02/08/02 (Reno/Carson). Signed by: Scott W. Edwards. 02-02617
02/08/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. 02-02618
03/11/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 03/08/02. Signed by: Gary H. Hatlestad. 02-04360
03/29/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 8, 2002. 02-05667
05/08/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 05/08/02. Signed by: Scott W. Edwards. 02-08089
05/08/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/14/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Directing Filing of Supplemental Appendix. A review of the appendix filed with the opening brief on February 8, 2002, indicates that the June 15, 2001, transcript was not included in the appendix. The opening brief, however, cites to those transcripts as "Transcript of Hearing, herein referred to as 'HT,' pages 1-146." Accordingly, appellant shall file a copy of that transcript as a supplemental appendix within 15 days from the date of this order. The supplemental appendix shall be prepared in a manner consistent with the citations to the transcript in the briefs. 02-08421
05/16/2002AppendixFiled Appendix. Supplemental Appendix. 02-08676
10/16/2002Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. Panel: Northern Nevada Panel. NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA
11/05/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA 02-19087
12/03/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-19225
12/03/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 5, 2002. 02-19225