judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BROWN (DERRICK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38460
Short Caption:BROWN (DERRICK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38106
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C173967Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/11/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/11/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. 01-15316
10/10/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-17087
11/06/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-17314
11/06/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/15/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 9, 2001. 01-17314