judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENT ALAN PROFFIT, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0102)
Case Number:S-10-0102Case Docketed On:05/05/2010
Linked To: S-10-0101
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:KENT ALAN PROFFIT, SR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KENT ALAN PROFFIT, SR., Appellant (Petitioner), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKent Alan Proffit Sr. Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/05/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/05/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/19/2010Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
06/04/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/18/2010Event - Rejected Filing - returned Motion to Reconsider received on 6/17/10 as untimely.EventRejected FilingFinal
01/10/2012Notice-Incoming - Other Unfiled "Motion to Compel: The Petitioner's Compete Docketing Statements...S-10-0101 and S-10-0102." Copy of docket page for both cases mailed to Mr. ProffitNotice-IncomingOtherFinal