judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DIANA M.R. HAYDEN V. D.C. PUBLIC SCHOOLS RESIDENCY OFFICE

Case Information: 11-AA-0455
Short Caption:DIANA M.R. HAYDEN V. D.C. PUBLIC SCHOOLS RESIDENCY OFFICEClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Not SpecifiedFiled Date:04/13/2011

Opening Event Date:04/13/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/10/2013Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/02/2014

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDiana M.R. Hayden NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. PUBLIC SCHOOLS RESIDENCY OFFICEN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/21/2000 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Administrative Agency shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17.
04/13/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
04/13/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY (EMERGENCY)
04/13/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
04/14/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
04/18/2011TMC - petitioner's motion for stay - oppo
04/19/2011RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION - to petitioner's EMERGENCY to motion for stay
04/20/2011 On consideration of PETITIONER'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY, the opposition thereto and it appearing that the parties have agreed to the relief petitioner seeks, it is ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION TO STAY IS DENIED AS MOOT. (BROBST)
09/10/2013FiledRecord Completed
09/10/2013FiledRecord On Appeal
09/17/2013FiledBriefing Order
11/04/2013FiledOrder - directing motion, brief & appendix (Petitioner)
12/09/2013FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
12/09/2013FiledDismissed
01/02/2014FiledMandate