judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HUMBLE OIL AND REFINING COMPANY v. ROBERT S. CALVERT, ET AL.

Case: B-2685
B-2685
04/19/1971
Application for Writ of Error
HUMBLE OIL AND REFINING COMPANY
ROBERT S. CALVERT, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/11/1972Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/09/1971Response to Brief filedPetitioner
07/29/1971Supplement to ResponseRespondent
05/14/1971Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/10/1971Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/04/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
05/03/1971Response to PetitionPetitioner
04/19/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/30/1972Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
07/18/1972Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
04/25/1972Response to Motion filed
04/11/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/29/1972Order from Lower Court filed
03/29/1972Opinion issued
08/09/1971Response to Brief filed
07/29/1971Supplement to Response
07/07/1971Document received (See Remarks)
07/07/1971Document received (See Remarks)
07/07/1971Document received (See Remarks)
07/07/1971Document received (See Remarks)
05/14/1971Reply to Response
05/10/1971Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/04/1971Response to Petition
05/03/1971Response to Petition
04/19/1971Conditional application for writ of error filedFiling granted
04/19/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/19/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robert S. Calvert, et al.Respondent
Humble Oil and Refining CompanyPetitioner
GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATIONAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information