judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REDMAN VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38427
Short Caption:REDMAN VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CF0004006Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/04/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Day R. Williams--check no. 09892.
09/04/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 01-14907
09/05/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Proof of service on parties and district judge. Due Date: 10 days
09/10/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Julie A. Slabaugh, Deputy A.G. 01-15216
09/18/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Betsy Greenspan, Attorney General's Office. 01-15768
09/20/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Affidavit of Service upon Hon. Steven L. Dobrescu. 01-15872
10/03/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 01-16624
10/17/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Petition. 01-17521
11/02/2001Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 01-18401
11/07/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Petition. Dismissing Petition for Writ of Mandamus. On October 17, 2001, petitioner filed a document stating that Judge Dobrescu has now ruled on all pending motions and that petitioner dismisses this mandamus action. We construe petitioner's document as a motion to dismiss, and because it appears that the petition is now moot, we grant the motion, and " . . . dismiss this petition for a writ of mandamus." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-18562
11/07/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No notice in lieu of remittitur issued.