judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENNETH MADSEN, M.D. v. BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF SWEETWATER COUNTY, WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0067)
Case Number:S-10-0067Case Docketed On:03/31/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:KENNETH MADSEN, M.D. v. BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF SWEETWATER COUNTY, WYOMING
Full Title:KENNETH MADSEN, M.D., Petitioner, v. BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF SWEETWATER COUNTY, WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerKennth Madsen M.D.Patrick J. Murphy
RespondentBoard of Trustees of Memorial Hospital of Sweetwater County, WyomingPaul D. Schierer
Antonio Edmundo Bendezu
Greg Weisz
Other Particpants
Interested ObserverBrim Healthcare, Inc., an Oregon CorporationBradley Trent Cave
Isaac Nathan Sutphin

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Governmental Claims
Opinion Number:2011 WY 36
Citation:248 P.3d 1151 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/31/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/31/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/31/2010Petition - Writ - review and copy of Petition on cdPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
04/15/2010Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
04/16/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Respondent, received original and five copies of Response, will send sixth copyEventPhone CallFinal
04/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Petition for Writ of ReviewEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/21/2010Order - Petition for review - grantOrderPetition for review - grantFinal
05/05/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - IndexNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/08/2010Event - Other. Contacted counsel for petitioner's office regarding filing of brief of petitioner. Since counsel were listed who are not admitted pro hac vice, and this office failed to place a water mark for filing on the document, the entry was deleted and will be resubmitted for proper filing.EventOtherFinal
06/08/2010Brief - PetitionerBriefPetitionerFinal
06/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Petitioner Ken Madsen, M.D.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/26/2010Motion - Other - to designate additional pleadings.MotionOtherFinal
07/26/2010Brief - RespondentBriefRespondentFinal
07/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Respondent Board of Trustees of Memorial Hospital of Sweetwater County, Wyoming; and received copy of brief on disk.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Respondent/Plaintiff's motion to allow designation of additional portions of the record for transmission; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/05/2010Brief - Petitioner replyBriefPetitioner replyFinal
08/06/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Petitioner, Kenneth Madsen, M.D.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/10/2010Order - Granting Motion to Allow Designation of Additional Portions of the Record for TransmissionOrderGrantFinal
08/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/02/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/14/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Paul Schierer for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick J. Murphy for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
10/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
10/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Petitioner's Notice Additional Case Authority and Petitioner's Second Notice of Additional Case AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/20/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court ( Patrick J. Murphy for appellant; Antonio E. Bendezu and Paul Schierer, argument by Mr. Schierer for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/20/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/01/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Kite writing for the Court; Justice Voigt filed an opinion concurring in part and dissenting in part.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/17/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/17/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/22/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/21/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal