judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOUSTON VS. TERRY

Case Information: 38422
Short Caption:HOUSTON VS. TERRYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A431357Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/28/2002How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/04/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/04/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-14849
09/04/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
11/14/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On September 2, 2001, we directed appellant to pay the filing fee required by NRS 2.250(1)(a). In response, appellant submitted copies of applications for in forma pauperis status, dated August 21, 2001, and September 10, 2001. Neither application bears the district court clerk's file stamp. It is thus not clear from the documents before us that appellant has actually submitted either application to the district court. Accordingly, we direct appellant to submit a file-stamped copy of his application to this court within 10 days of the date of this order. 01-18985
12/24/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 23, 2001 and October 25, 2001. Court Reporter: Cathy Nelson. 01-21668
01/02/2002Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/16/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 02-01086
01/28/2002Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. 02-01808
01/28/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/19/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 02-12445
08/12/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. On July 19, 2002, appellant and respondents filed a joint stipulation to dismiss the appeal. "We dismiss this appeal, with the parties to bear their own costs and attorney fees." fn2[Although appellant was not granted leave to proceed in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have received and considered appellant's proper person documents. We deny his motions as moot in light of this order.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-13724
08/12/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney David R. Clayson. Returned unfiled, the original Respondent's Answering Brief received on March 21, 2002.
08/12/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
08/13/2002RemittiturIssued Return Letter. Returned Record on Appeal this day. 02-13827
08/22/2002RemittiturFiled Letter: Entered Receipt for Documents. Received by County Clerk on August 16, 2002. 02-13827