judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BILLIE COLLEEN JOHNSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0250)
Case Number:S-11-0250Case Docketed On:10/26/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:BILLIE COLLEEN JOHNSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BILLIE COLLEEN JOHNSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBillie Colleen JohnsonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
Stewart Michael Young
Joshua Beau Taylor
Dustin J. Richards
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2012 WY 112
Citation:283 P.3d 1145

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/26/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/26/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/08/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/09/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/09/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/11/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/11/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/28/2012Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
02/28/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/29/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Consent and Approval and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/05/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/12/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Tina N. Olson obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/20/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/26/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/26/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/10/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Dustin J. Richards obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/18/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Olson for Appellant; D. Michael Pauling and Dustin J. Richards, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Richards, for Appellee) and taken under advisementEventOral argument presentedFinal
04/18/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/22/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/07/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/07/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/07/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/12/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 9/10/12ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal