Case Information: 79774 | |||
Short Caption: | BAHNS VS. HUBER (CHILD CUSTODY) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 79773 , 79773-COA , 80717 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D564695 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/09/2019 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC) | ||
10/09/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | 19-41823 | |
10/09/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines/Fast Track Child Custody. (SC) | 19-41825 | |
10/14/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED). (SC) | ||
10/23/2019 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." NNP19-KP/RP/EC (SC) | 19-43763 | |
11/18/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | 19-47214 | |
11/18/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | ||
12/06/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 23, 2019. (SC) | 19-47214 |