judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANGELO RICHARDSON V. BEYONCE KNOWLES

Case Information: 11-CV-0443
Short Caption:ANGELO RICHARDSON V. BEYONCE KNOWLESClassification:Appeals - Civil - Property
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB9549-10Filed Date:04/05/2011

Opening Event Date:04/05/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAngelo Richardson YPro SeN
AppelleeBeyonce Knowles NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/05/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/28/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed as IMPROPERLY FILED since an appealable order has not been identified... (BY: ETW)
05/05/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
06/14/2011 On further consideration of this this court's 4/28/11 order...and the response thereto, wherein appellant still failed to identify the order that he sought to appeal, it is ORDERED that this APPEAL IS DISMISSED for appellant's failure to comply w/this court's order to identify a final and appealable order... (BY: ETW)
06/14/2011DISMISSED
07/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED