judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BASS (JERRY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38443
Short Caption:BASS (JERRY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40973
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C173280Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/07/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/07/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-15122
10/30/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days within which to appoint counsel for appellant. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from appointment or appearance of counsel the district court clerk shall transmit to this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order, and serve a copy of this order on appellant's counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days to file a notice of appearance in this court. fn2[All filing deadlines shall commence to run from the date on which counsel is required to enter an appearance in this court.] 01-18138
12/24/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Christina A. Hinds. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-21649
01/14/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appointment of Counsel. Certified copy of notice from Clark County Clerk filed in district court on January 9, 2002 enclosing a copy of minute order. Cristina Hinds appointed as counsel for appellant. 02-00924
03/05/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellant has failed to file the docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested. Appellant shall, within ten (10) days of the date of this order, file and serve the required documents. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 02-04012
03/29/2002MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 02-05666
04/15/2002TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 3/8/01. Court Reporter: Lisa Makowski. 02-06663
04/30/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Appellant has filed a motion to dismiss this appeal voluntarily. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[In lieu of the issuance of the remittitur, we conclude that the one-year period for filing a post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus in the district court under NRS 34.726(1) shall commence to run from the date of this order.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-07640
04/30/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.