judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KRYSTAL DAWN NELSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0085)
Case Number:S-10-0085Case Docketed On:04/19/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:KRYSTAL DAWN NELSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KRYSTAL DAWN NELSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKrystal Dawn NelsonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
John S. Burbridge
Affie Burnside Ellis

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 159
Citation:245 P.3d 282 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/19/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/07/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/23/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/05/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/16/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Exhibit; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John S. Burbridge for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/13/2010Event - Phone Call - Received phone call from AG's Office. Affie Ellis, Assistant Attorney General, to argue case instead of John Burbridge.EventPhone CallFinal
09/21/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda Pojman, Assistant Attorney General, and Affie Ellis, Assistant Attorney General, argument by Ms. Ellis for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/21/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/08/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Kite writing for the Court (Copy of opinion sent to District Supervisor for Probation and Parole, as Appellant is no incarcerated).OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/27/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/27/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/27/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/29/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/28/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal