Case Information: 38442 | |||
Short Caption: | AMERICANA VS. PINE DEVELOPMENT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A409042 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 09/14/2001 / Robinson, David | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/07/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00--Prudential check no. 18913 | ||
09/07/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-15110 | |
09/14/2001 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David K. Robinson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
10/01/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-16457 | |
10/05/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. David K. Robinson. | ||
10/05/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. for Docketing Statement filed on 10/01/01. | 01-16772 | |
10/11/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Michael Stoberski will represent appellant Americana for settlement conference. | 01-17168 | |
10/12/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. David K. Robinson. | ||
10/16/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Michael E. Stoberski will be attending the Settlement Conference for Appellant. | 01-17456 | |
12/03/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondent Pine Development's Motion to Dismiss American's Appeal Pursuant to Nevada Constitution, Art. 6 Sec. 6. | 01-20243 | |
12/07/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 01-20552 | |
12/13/2001 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant Americana Corporations Opposition to Respondent's Pine Developments Motion to Dismiss. | 01-20992 | |
12/20/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Pursuant to NRAP 16(g), the settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. We defer ruling on respondent's motion to dismiss this appeal pending completion of our jurisdictional review. The time deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. | 01-21452 | |
01/17/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We grant respondent's motion, and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 02-01221 | |
02/12/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-01543 | |
02/12/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/26/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 14, 2002. | 02-01543 |