judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RODNEY G. HOLLINS V. ROMMELL G. HOLLINS

Case Information: 11-CV-0442
Short Caption:RODNEY G. HOLLINS V. ROMMELL G. HOLLINSClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB867-03Filed Date:04/01/2011

Opening Event Date:04/01/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/21/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/19/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/18/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRodney G. Hollins N
Darrel S. ParkerYY
AppelleeRommell G. Hollins N
Joseph C. Ruddy, Jr.NN
Randy McRaeYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/01/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/19/2011CIVIL APPEALS SCREENING STATEMENT (*filed by appellant's attorney, Darrel S. Parker, Esquire)
04/19/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
04/27/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be LIMITED TO the March 16, 2011 denial of the motion to late file. (BY: ETW)
04/27/2011TMC - OTSC - appellee's motion to dismiss - ROTSC - reply
04/28/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (McRae)
05/03/2011RECORD INDEX
05/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/16/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
05/26/2011APPELLEE'S REPLY_ to aplts' response to order to show cause
06/20/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTINO TO DISMISS IS DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal is LIMITED TO THE MARCH 16, 2011 ORDER that denied appellant's motion for an extension of time to file his NOA. It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S BRIEF AND APPENDIX...shall be filed W/N 40 DAYS...and appellee's brief shall be filed W/N 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. (BRNBKG)
07/28/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/10/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/30/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/30/2011FiledAppendix (Attached to Brief) (Appellant)
09/30/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellee)Granted
10/18/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellee)
10/21/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/21/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/19/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, Belson
08/23/2012FiledReversed And Remanded (MOJ) (Glickman and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Judge.)
09/18/2012FiledMandate