judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: CONTINUING LEGAL EDUCATION (CLE)

Case Information: 38437
Short Caption:IN RE: CONTINUING LEGAL EDUCATION (CLE)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 56143 , 58961
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Other - Petition
Disqualifications:RoseCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/07/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Rose. CLE Matter.
09/07/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/07/2001Petition/BarFiled Petition. 01-15091
10/03/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Joseph J. Huggens and John M. O'Neal). 01-16678
10/22/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Martin H. Firman). 01-17719
10/22/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Lawrence L. Lozensky). 01-17721
10/25/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Margaret M. Byrne). 01-17955
11/26/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (Jeffrey D. Conway & Gary R. Huntsman) 01-19680
11/26/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (Carl M. Joerger) 01-19681
11/26/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (Cuthbert E. Mack) 01-19682
11/26/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (Gregory F. Wilson) 01-19683
01/03/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (David T. Spurlock, Jr.) 02-00184
01/31/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal. (Dan M. Durrant) 02-02053
03/08/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (John R. Brydon). 02-04182
03/08/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Sharon E. Claassen). 02-04209
04/11/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (John J. Brannelly, Jr.). 02-06427
05/30/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Karen T. Grant-Head). 02-09408
09/10/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant the Board's request and dismiss the petition with prejudice as to respondent attorneys Joseph J. Huggins, John M. O'Neal, Martin H. Firman, Lawrence L. Lozensky, Margaret M. Byrne, Jeffrey D. Conway, Gary R. Huntsman, Carl M. Joerger, Cuthbert E. Mack, Gregory F. Wilson, David T. Spurlock, Jr., Dan M. Durrant, John R. Brydon, Sharon E. Claassen, John J. Brannelly, Jr., and Karen T. Grant-Head. The following active members of the State Bar shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this court should not grant the Board's petition and why their status should not be changed from active to inactive and, from the date of such change of status, be prohibited from practicing law in the State of Nevada until reinstated as allowed under SCR 213: Christopher L. Birkin, Judith H. Braecklein, James W. Erbeck, Gerard A. Fierro, Jeffrey E. Fisher, Milton G. Mullanax, Mitchell Ogron, David P. Olson, Andres R. Rappard, David C. Sampson, Melissa A. Sgrillo, Paul A. Sherman, Sangeeta Singal, Gregory S. Skinner. The following inactive members of the State Bar shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this court should not grant the Board's petition and why their rights to be reinstated to active status should not be conditioned on full compliance with SCR 213, in addition to any conditions of reinstatement already imposed or which may hereafter be imposed: Walter R. Davis, Creighton G. Oler. The following disbarred, disabled or suspended members of the State Bar shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this court should not grant the Board's petition and why their rights to be reinstated to active status should not be conditioned on full compliance with SCR 213, in addition to any conditions of reinstatement already imposed or which may hereafter be imposed: Melissa Collins, Dwight E. Duncan, Clarence E. Gamble, Daniel M. Hurt, George M. Johnson, James A. Stone. fn1[The Honorable Robert E. Rose, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] 02-15620
10/16/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (David C. Sampson). 02-18024
10/17/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (George W. Johnson). 02-18103
10/17/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Gregory S. Skinner). 02-18104
10/22/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Jeffrey E. Fisher and Paul A. Sherman). 02-18341
12/04/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Consent to Dismissal (Gerard A. Fierro). 02-20726
02/25/2003Order/Dispositional BarFiled Order Granting Bar Petition. Order Granting Petition. On September 7, 2001, the Board of Continuing Legal Education (the Board) filed a petition with this court to order certain members of the State Bar of Nevada (respondent attorneys) to show cause why their membership status should not be changed from active to inactive, and requiring certain inactive members to show cause why their rights of reinstatement to active status should not be conditioned upon full compliance with SCR 213. Thereafter, the Board, by way of documents entitled 'Consent to Dismissal', informed this court that the following respondent attorneys have satisfied the requirements set forth in SCR 205 through 215: Joseph J. Huggins, John M. O'Neal, Martin H. Firman, Lawrence L. Lozensky, Margaret M. Byrne, Jeffrey D. Conway, Gary R. Huntsman, Carl M. Joerger, Cuthbert E. Mack, Gregory F. Wilson, David T. Spurlock, Jr., Dan M. Durrant, John R. Brydon, Sharon E. Claassen, John J. Brannelly, Jr., and Karen T. Grant-Head. Accordingly, on September 10, 2002, this court entered an order, pursuant to the Board's requests, dismissing the petition with prejudice as to the above-named attorney. Further, we directed the remaining respondent attorneys to show cause within thirty days why this court should not grant the Board's petition. The Board filed documents with this court entitled 'Consent to Dismissal' and informed this court that the following respondent attorneys have also satisfied the requirements set forth in SCR 205 through 215 inclusive. We grant the Board's request and hereby dismiss the petition with prejudice as to respondent attorneys David C. Sampson, George W. Johnson, Gregory S. Skinner, Jeffrey E. Fisher, Paul A. Sherman and Gerard A. Fierro. The remaining respondent attorneys have failed to respond to our order of September 10, 2002. Accordingly, we grant the Board's petition as to these attorneys. The status of the following respondent attorneys shall be changed from active to inactive, and their rights of reinstatement shall be conditioned upon full compliance with SCR 213: Christopher L. Birkin, Judith H. Braecklein, James W. Erbeck, Milton G. Mullanax, Mitchell Ogron, David P. Olson, Andres R. Rappard, Melissa A. Sgrillo and Sangeeta Singal. Additionally, the right of each of the following inactive members of the State Bar to be reinstated to active status shall be conditioned upon full compliance with SCR 213, in addition to any conditions of reinstatement already imposed on them. Walter R. Davis and Creighton G. Oler. Finally, the right of each of the following disbarred, suspended or disabled members of the State Bar to be reinstated to active status shall be conditioned on full compliance with SCR 213, in addition to any conditions of reinstatement already imposed on them. Melissa Collins, Dwight E. Duncan, Clarence E. Gamble, Daniel M. Hurt and James A. Stone. fn2[The Honorable Robert E. Rose, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC 03-03112
02/25/2003Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
03/14/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement (Milton G. Mullanax). 03-04324
08/11/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement (Judith H. Braecklein). 03-13330
01/03/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Completion of Requirements for Reinstatement (James W. Erbeck). No action required. 08-00236