judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WELFRED C. ORTIZ V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0435
Short Caption:WELFRED C. ORTIZ V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-13594-09Filed Date:04/06/2011

Opening Event Date:04/06/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/26/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/14/2012
Argued/Submitted:10/10/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/23/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWelfred C. Ortiz Y
Julian S. GreenspunYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Leslie Ann Gerardo YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/06/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/29/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Julian Greenspun, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/29/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Julian Greenspun, Esquire
05/31/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
08/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (15 pgs/tape) 3/30/10 proc.
08/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (65 pgs/Ronan) 4/5/10 proc.
08/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (181 pgs/McCarn) 4/12/10 proc.
08/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (90 pgs/Hill) 4/13/10 proc.
08/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (72 pgs/McCarn) 4/13/10 proc.
08/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (143 pgs/Hill) 4/14/10 proc.
08/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (139 pgs/Hill) 4/15/10 proc.
08/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (178 pgs/Swaringer) 4/20/10 proc.
08/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (119 pgs/Swaringer) 4/21/10 proc.
08/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (22 pgs/Hawkins) 4/27/10 proc.
08/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (27 pgs/Etekochay) 1/6/11 proc.
08/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #12 (8 pgs/tape) 1/20/11 proc
08/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #13 (130 pgs/Burr) 3/11/11 proc. w/cd
08/26/2011FiledRecord Copies
08/26/2011FiledRecord Index
08/26/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #14 (SEALED pleading)
08/26/2011FiledRecord Completed
09/07/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant)
09/08/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/11/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to November 19, 2011 (no oppo) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
10/18/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to file brief and limited appendix to 11/19/21.
11/15/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/15/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant) (attached to the brief)
12/07/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
12/19/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 1/16/12.
01/10/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
01/23/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 2/14/12.
02/14/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
02/14/2012FiledBriefing Completed
02/29/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
03/08/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
03/13/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant) to 3/29/12.
03/21/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
04/05/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
04/10/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
07/13/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #15 (30 pgs/Etekochay) 12/10/10 proc. w/cd
08/14/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/17/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
10/04/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
10/10/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Thompson, Pryor Julian S. Greenspun, Esq. for appellant Leslie Ann Gerardo, Esq. for appellee
10/17/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Staying Appeal
06/07/2013FiledLetter From Mr. Ortiz regarding the status of his 23-110 motion filed in the Superior Court (Appellant)
07/09/2013FiledLetter To Attorney Julian S. Greenspun from the Clerk of the Court regarding a document from your client styled "Motion for a Writ of Mandamus and for Release Pending Appeal"
10/21/2013FiledLetter From Appellant addressed to counsel (Appellant)
12/31/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ)(Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges; and Pryor, Senior Judge)
01/23/2014FiledMandate