judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SECRETARY OF STATE VS. BROWN

Case Information: 38433
Short Caption:SECRETARY OF STATE VS. BROWNCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0001229A
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A438022
Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Venue
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/19/2001 / Olsen, PhilipSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:10/15/2002 at 8:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/04/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/04/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14934
09/19/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Philip A. Olsen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/10/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 01-17116
10/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Partially Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation filed on October 10, 2001, this appeal is dismissed as to respondents Tom Skancke and The Skancke Company, only. The clerk shall remove Tom Skancke, an individual and The Skancke Company, a Nevada Corporation, as respondents from the caption on this court's docket. 01-17932
11/02/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to District Judge (Hon. Lee A. Gates) and Clark County Clerk regarding partial dismissal of appeal. They both inadvertantly were not served a copy of the order filed on October 24, 2001. A copy of the order was included with the letters.
11/09/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. Pursuant to the written request of the settlement judge and good cause appearing, this appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Appellant shall file the docketing statement within 15 days from the date of this order. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 01-18808
11/26/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-19771
11/26/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-19773
03/08/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 03/08/02. Signed by: Kateri Cavin. 02-04216
03/08/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 02-04217
04/12/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 04/10/02. Signed by: Todd L. Bice (Respondent Station Casinos) and Burce M. Judd (Respondent Brown). 02-06570
04/12/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent's Supplemental Appendix. 02-06571
05/13/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 05/13/02. Signed by: Kateri Cavin. 02-08294
06/07/2002OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin.
08/22/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 15, 2002, at 8:30 a.m. (NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA)
09/30/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
10/14/2002MotionFiled Motion. Unopposed Motion to Continue Oral Argument Pending Settlement. 02-17746
10/14/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Vacating Argument and Setting for Submission. On October 14, 2002, appellant filed a motion to continue the oral argument of this matter. As cause for the motion, appellant states that 'the parties to this appeal have agreed to settle the underlying proceedings and dismiss this appeal. Appellant further states that counsel for respondents does not oppose the motion. Cause appearing, we grant appellant's motion. We hereby vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for October 15, 2002, at 8:30 a.m. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a motion or stipulation to dismiss this appeal or otherwise inform this court, in writing, of the status of this matter. 02-17748
11/14/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 02-19555
11/22/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 02-20159
11/22/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.