judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EDWARD ELLIOTT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0074)
Case Number:S-10-0074Case Docketed On:04/06/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Converse CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Certified Question - State District Court
Short Title:EDWARD ELLIOTT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:EDWARD ELLIOTT, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEdward ElliottR. Michael Vang
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Res judicata/Collateral estoppel
Opinion Number:2011 WY 32
Citation:247 P.3d 501

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/06/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/06/2010Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order certifying question Rule 11Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder certifying question Rule 11Final
04/06/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/21/2010Order - Certified Question - Accepting questions/briefingOrderCertified Question - Accepting questions/briefingFinal
06/03/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/07/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/08/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Edward ElliottEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/17/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/31/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/14/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - R. Michael Vang for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/20/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (R. Michael Vang for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/20/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/24/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order answering certified question in the negative, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/14/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal