judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSE GILBERTO PORTILLO V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0431
Short Caption:JOSE GILBERTO PORTILLO V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-6048-09Filed Date:04/01/2011

Opening Event Date:04/01/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/17/2012
Argued/Submitted:09/25/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/15/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJose Portillo Y
Molly Cannon YN
Jeffrey B. O'TooleNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Peter S. SmithYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/01/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/29/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Thomas D. Engle, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/29/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Thomas D. Engle, Esquire
05/10/2011APPEARANCE- of Molly Cannon on behalf of aplt
05/10/2011APPEARANCE- of Danya A.Dayson on behalf of aplt
05/10/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION (ex parte) for issuance of voucher to obtain interpreter services.
05/10/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (5 pgs/tape) 3/16/09 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (50 pgs/Hunt) 3/30/09 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (10 pgs/McCarn) 5/22/09 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (5 pgs/tape) 9/11/09 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (8 pgs/Ronan) 10/23/09 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (8 pgs/Burr) 12/18/09 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (8 pgs/Hawkins) 3/12/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (11 pgs/Swaringer) 10/7/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (13 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 10/28/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (11 pgs/Van Bremen) 11/19/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (42 pgs/Van Bremen) 11/29/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (134 pgs/Van Bremen) 11/29/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (205 pgs/Van Bremen) 11/30/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (88 pgs/Van Bremen) 12/1/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (348 pgs/Johnson) 12/6-7/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #16 (161 pgs/Kaczorowski) 12/8/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #17 (138 pgs/Johnson) 12/9-10/10 proc.
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #18 (40 pgs/Coney) 3/11/11 proc. w/cd
07/07/2011RECORD INDEX
07/07/2011RECORD COPIES
07/07/2011RECORD COMPLETED
08/04/2011FiledORDER SUA SPONTE - Withdraw Appointed Counsel(Thomas Engle)
08/04/2011FiledBriefing Order and denying as moot prior counsel's ex parte motion for issuance of voucher to obtain interpreter services.
09/06/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief & Appendix to October 18, 2011 (no oppo). Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 10/18/11.
10/05/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until December 19, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
10/12/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's moiton for an extension of time within whihc to file the brief to 12/19/11.
11/28/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)Granted
12/09/2011FiledOrder Granting Counsel Danya A. Dayson, Esquire motion to withdraw.
12/19/2011FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellant)Granted
12/19/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
12/19/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
12/28/2011FiledOrder Granting Appellant's motion to supplement the record.
01/05/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #19 (Attachement A)
01/11/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
01/18/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for extension to file brief on 2/17/12.
02/17/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
02/17/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/08/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
03/14/2012FiledReply Brief (with supplemental appendix) (Appellant)
04/06/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
04/11/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/19/2012FiledAppearance by Jeffrey B. O'Toole attorney for the appellant
09/21/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
09/25/2012FiledArgued Before Glicjman,Blackburne-Rigsby,Oberly Jeffery O'Toole Esq.,,for appellant. Peter S. Smith Esq.,for appellee
03/21/2013FiledRemanded (OPINION) (Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, and Oberly, Associate Judges.)
04/15/2013FiledMandate