judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

BETTY JOHNSON, A FEME SOLE v. BELVA REED, ET VIR

Case: B-2707
B-2707
04/30/1971
Application for Writ of Error
BETTY JOHNSON, A FEME SOLE
BELVA REED, ET VIR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/20/1972Notice of Appeal filedPetitioner
07/27/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/04/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
04/30/1971Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
04/30/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/16/1972Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
01/20/1972Notice of Appeal filed
07/30/1971Response to Motion filed
07/27/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/04/1971Response to Petition
04/30/1971Supplemental Brief filed
04/30/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/30/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Betty Johnson, a Feme SolePetitioner
Belva Reed, et virRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information