judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES EARL PRINGLE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0437
Short Caption:CHARLES EARL PRINGLE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD18145-10Filed Date:04/07/2011

Opening Event Date:04/07/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/27/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:08/18/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/29/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/27/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles Earl PringleY
Gaillard T. HuntYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Sean M. Lewis YN
Kristina L. AmentNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/07/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/27/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (84pgs/Tape) 3/25/11 proc. w/CD
04/27/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/28/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Gaillard Hunt, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
04/28/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Gaillard Hunt, Esquire
05/02/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
05/03/2011RECORD INDEX
05/03/2011RECORD COPIES
05/04/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/13/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/13/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
07/15/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (30 Days) Brief (Appellee)
07/19/2011FiledAnswer/Response - to aple's motion for extension of time to file brief (Appellant)
07/26/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #2 (4pgs/Tape) 9/28/10 proc.
07/26/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #3 (6pgs/Tape) 11/5/10 proc.
07/26/2011LodgedSupplemental Record - #4 (21pgs/Tape) 1/7/11 proc.
07/26/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #5 (6pgs/Tape) 2/9/11 proc. w/CD
08/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until August 18, 2011
08/18/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/18/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/01/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/06/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/06/2012FiledMotion for production of relevant statistics (Appellant)
03/07/2012FiledMemorandum from appellee's advising court that Kristina Ament will argue the case instead of Sean Lewis (Appellee)
03/14/2012FiledOpposition to appellant's motion for production of statistics (Appellee)
03/19/2012FiledOrder directing parties what to be prepared to address at oral argument.
03/23/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
03/29/2012FiledArgued before Judge Glickman, Thompson, Steadman
08/10/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Steadman, senior Judge.)
08/23/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
11/19/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc
11/27/2012FiledMandate
02/05/2013FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
03/07/2013FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)