judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DEMETRIOS QUINTANA V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0436
Short Caption:DEMETRIOS QUINTANA V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM98-11Filed Date:04/04/2011

Opening Event Date:04/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/04/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDemetrios Quintana YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
John L. HillNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/28/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Chantal Jean-Baptiste, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
04/28/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Chantal Jean-Baptiste, Esquire
05/16/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
07/26/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #1 (85pgs/Wood) 3/14/11 proc. w/CD
07/29/2011FiledRecord Index
07/29/2011FiledRecord Copies
08/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/12/2011FiledAppendix (Attached to Brief) (Appellant)
08/30/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)
08/31/2011FiledTMC-MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE/MOTION TO FILE LODGED OPPO
09/15/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File (Appellant)Granted
10/13/2011FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE...
10/13/2011FiledOpposition to aple's motion for summary affirmance (Appellant)
10/13/2011FiledAffirmed
10/31/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
11/04/2011FiledMandate