judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEPHEN BERNARD BARNES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0079)
Case Number:S-10-0079Case Docketed On:04/12/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Johnson CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:STEPHEN BERNARD BARNES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STEPHEN BERNARD BARNES, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantStephen Bernard Barnes Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2010 WY 153
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/12/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/12/2010Order - Other - Appointing CounselOrderOtherFinal
04/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/15/2010Service - Mail returned, courtesy copy sent to Appellant. Called Public Defender's Office, they will find out which institution Appellant is incarcerated in.ServiceMail returnedFinal
04/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Other - Resent courtesy copy of docketing letter to Appellant at Johnson County Jail per address provided by Public Defender.Notice-OutgoingOtherFinal
04/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Change of address from Appellant. Resent courtesy copy of docketing letterNotice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
04/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - General IndexNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
04/21/2010Service - Mail returned - Docketing Letter and Order Appointing Counsel. Resent to Platte County JailServiceMail returnedFinal
05/19/2010Order - Denying Motion to RemandOrderDenyFinal
05/26/2010Motion - Remand to district court; and affidavit of appellant.MotionRemand to district courtFinal
05/26/2010Motion - Stay briefing - opposedMotionStay briefing - opposedFinal
05/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion for partial remand for evidentiary hearing on ineffective assistance of counsel.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants motion to stay briefing schedule; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/28/2010Order - Granting stay in proceedingsOrderGranting stayFinal
06/22/2010Order - Denying Motion for Partial Remand (and setting briefing)OrderDenyFinal
07/19/2010Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Kirk Morgan.MotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
07/19/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - motion to withdraw - Kirk MorganEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - motion for extension of time to file brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/20/2010Order - Grant - extension of time - to file brief of appellant.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/27/2010Motion - Stay - other - briefing (pro se)MotionStay - otherFinal
07/27/2010Motion - Other - Waive Appointed Counsel (pro se)MotionOtherFinal
07/28/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Appellant's Demand to Proceed Pro-se and Affidavit of Stephen Bernard BarnesNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/03/2010Order - Denying Motion to Withdraw, Order Denying Motion to Waive Appointed Counsel, and Order Denying Appellant's Demand to Proceed Pro SeOrderDenyFinal
08/05/2010Motion - Other - Appellants Motion of Objection (Pro se)MotionOtherFinal
08/24/2010Order - Denying Appellant's (pro se) Motion of ObjectionOrderDenyFinal
09/07/2010Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
09/07/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/07/2010Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
09/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw as counselEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file pro se briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Change of address for AppellantNotice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
09/28/2010Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel - Order granting permission for court-appointed counsel to withdraw.OrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
11/04/2010Brief - Appellant's "Motion of Response" to Anders BriefBriefAppellantFinal
11/24/2010Opinion - Published order affirming the District Court's order of dismissal.OpinionPublished orderFinal
12/01/2010Motion - Other - "Motion to the Court" (Motion only filed in this docket number because S-10-0079 has been decided)MotionOtherFinal
12/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/10/2010Record - Returned unfiled recordRecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
12/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/10/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/15/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/13/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal