judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HENTHORN VS. EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF NEV.

Case Information: 38436
Short Caption:HENTHORN VS. EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF NEV.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0000832AClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/19/2001 / Olsen, PhilipSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:04/16/2003 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:04/16/2003How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/06/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. (fee waived pursuant to NRS 616A.455.)
09/06/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-15081
09/19/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Philip A. Olsen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/26/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-16265
09/28/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Philip A. Olsen.
12/10/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-20677
12/19/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-21401
01/11/2002Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 02-00861
04/12/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 18, 2002. 02-06617
05/20/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 05/20/02. 02-08810
05/20/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 5. 02-08811
06/14/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 19, 2002. 02-10348
07/19/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent, EICON Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 07/19/02. 02-12382
07/19/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondents, EICON and Allan Lowson Brick Contractor's Joint Appendix. 02-12383
07/19/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent Allan Lowson Brick Contractor's Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 07/19/02. 02-12407
08/19/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 19, 2002. 02-14140
09/19/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 09/19/02. 02-16345
02/24/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on April 16, 2003, at 10:30 a.m. (NNP03-RR/WM/MG)
03/31/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
04/02/2003MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Substitution of Parties. 03-05531
04/02/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order to Supplement Motion. On April 2, 2003, attorney Peter J. Sferrazza filed a motion to substitute Judy Henthorn in the place of George Henthorn as appellant in this appeal pursuant to NRAP 43(a). Mr. Sferrazza shall have 7 days from the date of this order to supplement his motion with a copy of a probate court order appointing Judy Henthorn as the personal representative of George Henthorn. In the event the probate court has not yet appointed a person representative for George Henthorn, Mr. Sferrazza shall, withhin the same time period, so inform this court. 03-05578
04/09/2003Other Other. Filed Response to Order to Supplement Motion and Supplement to Motion for Substitution of Parites. 03-06003
04/14/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to Substitute Party filed April 2, 2003. The clerk of this court shall remove "George Henthorn" and add "Judy Henthorn, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gorge Henthorn" as appellant in this appeal. 03-06176
04/16/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP03-RR/WM/MG
08/20/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. fn1[Mr. Henthorn filed the appeal, but died while it was pending. Mrs. Henthorn was substituted as appellant under NRAP 43(a).] 'We reverse the district court's order and remand with instructions that the district court remand this matter to the appeals officer to (1) reconsider Henthorn's claim, and (2) take additional evidence consisting of the autopsy and any evidence necessary to interpret or rebut it.' NNP03-RR/WM/MG 03-14007
09/16/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-14075
09/16/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/24/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 17, 2003. 03-14075