judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAN KRUSE, n/k/a JAN TWYFORD v. JAMES KRUSE

Case Heading (S-10-0077)
Case Number:S-10-0077Case Docketed On:04/09/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Niobrara CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:JAN KRUSE, n/k/a JAN TWYFORD v. JAMES KRUSE
Full Title:JAN KRUSE, n/k/a JAN TWYFORD, Appellant (Defendant), v. JAMES KRUSE, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJan KruseSteve C.M. Aron
AppelleeJames KruseEdward A. Buchanan

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Marriage and Divorce - Property Division
Opinion Number:2010 WY 144
Citation:242 P.3d 1011

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/09/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/09/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/24/2010Event - Rejected Filing - brief of appellant for redactions in attachments.EventRejected FilingFinal
05/25/2010Event - Phone Call - contacted counsel's office regarding filing brief with redactions.EventPhone CallFinal
05/26/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/27/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Correct Hardcopy of Certificate of ServiceNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
07/14/2010Event - Rejected Filing - brief of appellee submitted after 5 p.m. Counsel will motion to file late.EventRejected FilingFinal
07/14/2010Motion - Accept late filing - brief of appelle.MotionAccept late filingFinal
07/16/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Motion to Accept Late FilingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/03/2010Order - Other - Granting Consideration of Appellee's BriefOrderOtherFinal
08/10/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/10/2010Event - Hardcopy received Appellee's Response BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/16/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Per Chief Justice hard copy of brief electronically submitted accepted.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/17/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/31/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/31/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/03/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/03/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Affidavits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/05/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
11/09/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/29/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/29/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/01/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/30/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal