judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHARON C. MOORE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0434
Short Caption:SHARON C. MOORE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:11-CF-0434Consolidated: 12-CO-0179
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-18269-09Filed Date:04/06/2011

Opening Event Date:04/06/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/18/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:07/26/2012
Argued/Submitted:12/07/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/30/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSharon C. Moore YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Elana SuttenbergYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/06/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/29/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Edward Gain, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/29/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Edward Gain, Esquire
05/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (112 pgs/McCarn) 2/2/10 proc.
05/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (162 pgs/McCarn) 2/3/10 proc.
05/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (13 pgs/tape) 8/20/10 proc. w/cd
05/18/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (SEALED documents)
05/18/2011RECORD INDEX
05/18/2011RECORD COPIES
05/18/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/31/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
06/10/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
07/20/2011FiledMotion To Stay Appeal (Titled as: Motion to Hold Appeal in Abeyance or in the Alternative, to Extend Time) to pursue a D.C. Code Sec. 23-110 motion in the Superior Court (Appellant)
09/15/2011FiledOrder Denying Appellant's motion to stay
09/20/2011FiledMotion To Stay Appeal (Appellant)Denied as Moot
10/14/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte held motion for stay for 90 days, status (trial motion) due 1/6/12.
01/06/2012FiledStatus Report regarding pending (Appellant)
02/21/2012FiledMiscellaneous - supplement to 1/6/12, status of 23-110. (Appellant)
03/12/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's motion to stay as moot.
03/12/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals 11-CF-434 & 12-CO-179
03/12/2012FiledBriefing Order
03/13/2012FiledRecord Copies (12-CO-179)
03/13/2012FiledRecord Index (12-CO-179)
04/23/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
04/26/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 5/23/12
05/23/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Appellant)
05/23/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
06/04/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
06/26/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
06/26/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
06/26/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motions For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) and Clerk shall file the lodged brief and limited appendix.
07/26/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/26/2012FiledBriefing Completed
08/15/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
08/21/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/22/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant) to 8/29/12.
08/29/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
11/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/07/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Thompson, King
02/14/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.) ****AMENDED on 6/26/13, just to include the 12-CO-179 appeal number in the heading****
02/28/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for Rehearing/ Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Granted
03/07/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to March 28, 2013.
03/28/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
05/10/2013FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
05/14/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
08/30/2013FiledMandate