judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS AND ROBERT RUIZ, ET AL. v. BURKE W. INMAN, ET AL.

Case: B-2709
B-2709
05/03/1971
Application for Writ of Error
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS AND ROBERT RUIZ, ET AL.
BURKE W. INMAN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/1971Response to Brief filedRespondent
05/28/1971Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
05/20/1971Errata FiledRespondent
05/18/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
05/03/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/1971Response to Brief filed
05/28/1971Supplemental Brief filed
05/20/1971Errata Filed
05/18/1971Response to Petition
05/03/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/03/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Burke W. Inman, et al.Respondent
Railroad Commission of Texas and Robert Ruiz, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information