judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WARD (DALE) VS. WARDEN C/W 38455

Case Information: 38435
Short Caption:WARD (DALE) VS. WARDEN C/W 38455Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:38435*, 38455 Related Case(s): 34973 , 78475 , 78475-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR961014Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/05/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/05/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-14974
09/14/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 9/12/01. 01-15571
09/26/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/11/01 and 6/19/01. Court Reporters: Cindy Lee Brown and Eric V. Nelson. 01-16220
10/11/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-17195
10/11/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-17196
10/25/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-18013
11/28/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 38435/38455. 01-19894
12/11/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Stipulation Approved. On November 28, 2001, the parties to these appeals filed a stipulation to consolidate these appeals. The stipulation is approved and these appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. Nos. 38435/38455. (01-20736) 01-20736
08/15/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. These are consolidated appeals from an order of the district court denying appellant Dale Walter Ward's post-conviction petitions for writs of habeas corpus. For the reasons stated in the attached order of the district court, we "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 38435/38455 02-13946
09/10/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-14173
09/10/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/16/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 12, 2002. 02-14173