judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL DUANE BAILEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0433
Short Caption:MICHAEL DUANE BAILEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-16438-10Filed Date:04/06/2011

Opening Event Date:04/06/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/09/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/03/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/06/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael Bailey YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Ann K. H. SimonNN
Amanda J. Winchester YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/06/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/29/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Nancy Allen, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
04/29/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Nancy Allen, ESQUIRE
05/10/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (82 pgs/Richer) 12/13/10 proc.
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (103 pgs/Jeon) 12/15/10 proc.
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (134 pgs/Armstrong) 12/16/10 proc.
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (215 pgs/McCarn) 12/20/10 proc.
07/22/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (94 pgs/Davis) 12/21-22/10 proc. w/cd
07/25/2011FiledRecord Copies
07/25/2011FiledRecord Index
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (SEALED pleading)
07/25/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/19/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/08/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
09/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Apepllant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 12/27/11.
11/09/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/09/2011FiledAppendix (attacted to brief) (Appellant)
12/09/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
12/09/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/31/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/03/2012FiledSubmitted To Glickman,Farrell,Washington
07/13/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Glickman, Associate Judge, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
07/25/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
08/06/2012FiledMandate