Case: 10-94-00201-CV
10-94-00201-CV
06/23/1994
Divorce
Jessica Borsellino
Charles A. Borsellino
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/26/2002 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
12/17/2001 | Six yrs. passed final disposition. Record will be destroyed w/in 90 dys unless req. by trial court clerk. | | |
01/23/1995 | Case stored | | |
01/23/1995 | Mandate issued by this Court | | |
12/07/1994 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
11/30/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file NOA | Motion or Writ Denied | |
11/17/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file NOA | | |
11/09/1994 | No Description Available. | | |
07/06/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file NOA | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/24/1994 | Motion for extension of time to file NOA | | |
06/23/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/26/2002 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Borsellino, Charles A. | Appellee | Charles A. Borsellino |
Borsellino, Jessica | Appellant | Jessica Borsellino |
Trial Court Information
13th District Court
Navarro
Honorable Kenneth J. Douglas
94-00-03933-CV