judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KENNETH J. ZALOUDEK, JR. v. BECKY ZALOUDEK

Case Heading (S-10-0068)
Case Number:S-10-0068Case Docketed On:04/01/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:KENNETH J. ZALOUDEK, JR. v. BECKY ZALOUDEK
Full Title:KENNETH J. ZALOUDEK, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. BECKY ZALOUDEK, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKenneth J. Zaloudek Jr.William L. Combs
AppelleeBecky ZaloudekRichard J. Mulligan
Heather Noble

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Appellate Procedure, Jurisdiction - Appellate, Marriage and Divorce
Opinion Number:2010 WY 169
Citation:245 P.3d 336

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/01/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/01/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/07/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - IndexNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
05/19/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of the Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/06/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/14/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
07/26/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/26/2010Event - Phone Call. Received call from counsel for appellant advising that the cover page of the reply brief of appellant has the wrong case number, but he corrected the paper copies that are being mailed.EventPhone CallFinal
07/27/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/27/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court clerkNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/04/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, seven volumes. Volumes I-VI, Original Papers; Volume VII, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/31/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
12/21/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/06/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/06/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/12/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/10/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal