judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY D. MCCUTCHEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0425
Short Caption:ANTHONY D. MCCUTCHEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Lead: 09-CO-1125 Consolidated:11-CO-0425
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-9449-06Filed Date:03/30/2011

Opening Event Date:03/30/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/20/2012
Argued/Submitted:10/16/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/25/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony D. Mccutchen Y
William T. MorrisonYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Anne Y. ParkYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/24/2011FiledFinal Screening-Regular
03/30/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/31/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) William Morrison, Esquire
04/12/2011ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 09-CO-1125 and 11-CO-425 for all purposes. It is FURTHER ORDERED that William Morrison, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 11-CO-425 nunc pro tunc to March 31, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order addressing the issues raised in appeal no. 11-CO-425, will be4 issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, the record index and record copies required by D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
04/14/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of June 2011 through Sept 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by APR. 22, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
04/18/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
04/20/2011RECORD INDEX (11CO425)
04/20/2011RECORD COPIES (11CO425)
04/20/2011FiledRecord Completed
05/03/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
09/14/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
10/05/2011FiledBriefing Order of appellant, addressing the issues raised in appeal no. 11-CO-425 w/in 40 days.
10/27/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (11-co-1125) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/07/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion in appeal no. 11-CO-425 for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until December 14, 2011
12/14/2011FiledBrief (11-CO-425) (Appellant)
12/14/2011FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (11-CO-425) (Appellant)
01/17/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - until March 22, 2012 (11-CO-425) (Appellee)Granted
02/03/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief on or before March 22, 2012
03/22/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until April 5,2012 (Appellee) (11-CO-425)Granted
04/20/2012FiledBrief (Appellee) 11-CO-425
04/20/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and filing the lodged brief in appeal no. 11-CO-425
04/20/2012FiledBriefing Completed
05/08/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/02/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/09/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
07/16/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/10/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellee)Granted
10/15/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/15/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record w/appelant's affidavit (Appellant)Granted
10/16/2012FiledArgued Before Jugde Washington,Balckburne-Rigsby,Thompson. William T.Morrison Esq.,For appellant, Anne Y.Park Esq.,for appellee.
10/16/2012FiledOrder Granting aple's motion to supplement the record.
10/16/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to supplement the record and to file reply brief.
10/16/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
11/08/2012FiledSupplemental Record - #1 (Defendant's supplemental affidavit)
12/05/2012FiledSupplemental Record - #2 (DVD containing detective Martin's recorded interviews w/Eng, Ford, and Kastronis from government's trial file)
01/30/2013FiledRemanded (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, and Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges.)
02/25/2013FiledMandate