judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PLUMB (ANTHONY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38429
Short Caption:PLUMB (ANTHONY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35544 , 38193
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C162801Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/07/2002How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/04/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/04/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-14911
10/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38403/38429/38431/38452/38474/38476. 01-17806
01/07/2002Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 02-00366
01/07/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/15/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-08520
06/11/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-08623
06/11/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/22/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 15, 2002. 02-08623