judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LAKEIA REED V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0426
Short Caption:LAKEIA REED V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD5029-07Filed Date:03/30/2011

Opening Event Date:03/30/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/19/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/03/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLakeia Reed YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/30/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/12/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on Mach 30, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
04/19/2011RECORD INDEX
04/19/2011RECORD COPIES
04/19/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/12/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
07/06/2011 On consideration of this court's order of May 12, 2011, directing appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix, as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (Castillo)
07/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Denied as Moot
07/25/2011FiledMotion To Appoint Counsel (Appellant)Denied as Moot
08/08/2011FiledOrder To Show Cause
08/08/2011FiledTMC/OTSC/MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND EXTENSION OF TIME
09/28/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing APPEAL AS MOOT and DENYING MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AS MOOT.
09/28/2011FiledDismissed
11/03/2011FiledMandate