judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HAZEL RUTH PICKERING, ET AL. v. BRADLEY C. MILES, GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MARY JANE ROBBINS AND BETTY RUTH ROBBINS, MINORS

Case: B-2720
B-2720
05/10/1971
Application for Writ of Error
HAZEL RUTH PICKERING, ET AL.
BRADLEY C. MILES, GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MARY JANE ROBBINS AND BETTY RUTH ROBBINS, MINORS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/20/1971Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/25/1971Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/19/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
05/10/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/23/1972Opinion issued
09/20/1971Brief on the Merits
07/21/1971Document received (See Remarks)
07/12/1971Document received (See Remarks)
05/25/1971Reply to Response
05/19/1971Response to Petition
05/10/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/10/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hazel Ruth Pickering, et al.Petitioner
Bradley C. Miles, Guardian Ad Litem for Mary Jane Robbins and Betty Ruth Robbins, minorsRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information