judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO PULIDO

Case Information: 38423
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO PULIDOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D265769Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/03/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/04/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/04/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-14851
09/04/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
11/09/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-18737
12/03/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. 01-20184
12/03/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn4 [We note that appellant has failed to pay the filing fee required by NRS 2.250(1)(a). Although appellant's failure to pay the filing fee constitues an independent basis for dismissal, we have nonetheless considered the merits of this appeal.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML. 01-20957
01/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Record on Appeal returned this day. 02-00259
01/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/25/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2002. 02-00259