Case Information: 11-AA-0411 | |||
Short Caption: | SPENCERITA MULLENS V. D.C. DEP'T OF CONSUMER & REG. AFRS. | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Regulatory Affairs |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | DCRAI703043-10 | Filed Date: | 04/05/2011 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/05/2011 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 07/20/2011 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 11/08/2011 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | Spenceria Mullens | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Respondent | D.C. Department of Consumer and Regulatory Affairs | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
04/05/2011 | PETITION FOR REVIEW | |||
04/05/2011 | FILING FEE of $100.00. | |||
04/05/2011 | CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Tod Kim, Esq. | |||
04/12/2011 | On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC) | |||
07/20/2011 | Filed | Record On Appeal | ||
07/20/2011 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
07/28/2011 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
09/09/2011 | Filed | Order directing motion, brief and appendix | ||
10/17/2011 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal | ||
10/17/2011 | Filed | Dismissed | ||
11/08/2011 | Filed | Mandate |