judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION v. LEONARD A. SINGER

Case Heading (S-10-0064)
Case Number:S-10-0064Case Docketed On:03/29/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION v. LEONARD A. SINGER
Full Title:STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellant (Petitioner), v. LEONARD A. SINGER, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
Douglas Mann Lesley
AppelleeLeonard SingerMark L. Carman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 57
Citation:248 P.3d 1155

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/29/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/29/2010Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order of certification Rule 12.09(b)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder of certification Rule 12.09(b)Final
03/29/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/21/2010Order - Rule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptOrderRule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptFinal
06/08/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant/Petitioner, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
07/23/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent Leonard SingerEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/28/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/13/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/16/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/31/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
03/30/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/05/2011Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
04/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Motion for Payment of Attorney's Fees and CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/07/2011Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellee requesting signed Original copy.EventPhone CallFinal
04/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received, Appellant's Motion for Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs with original signatureEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/19/2011Response/Objection - Costs (Appellant)Response/ObjectionCostsFinal
04/19/2011Response/Objection - Costs (Appellee's response to objection)Response/ObjectionCostsFinal
04/19/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Objection to motion for payment of attorney's fees and costs (Appellant)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Response to Objection to Motion for Payment of Attorney's Fees and CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/03/2011Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
05/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/03/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/03/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/06/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/5/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal