judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FARMERS MUTUAL PROTECTIVE ASSOCIATION OF TEXAS v. IRA L. PACK, SR.

Case: B-2721
B-2721
05/10/1971
Application for Writ of Error
FARMERS MUTUAL PROTECTIVE ASSOCIATION OF TEXAS
IRA L. PACK, SR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/03/1971Supplement to Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/03/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/07/1971Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/25/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
05/10/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/03/1971Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
08/03/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/07/1971Reply to Response
05/25/1971Response to Petition
05/10/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/10/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ira L. Pack, Sr.Respondent
Farmers Mutual Protective Association of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information