judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN EDWARD DOBBINS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0253)
Parent: S-11-0050 Case Docketed On:10/27/2011
Consolidated:S-11-0253
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:STEVEN EDWARD DOBBINS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STEVEN EDWARD DOBBINS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteve Edward DobbinsDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea
Opinion Number:2012 WY 110
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/27/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/27/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/01/2011Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
11/03/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Consolidate CasesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/03/2011Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
12/13/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/27/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/30/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/06/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/15/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/17/2012Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/27/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/27/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/10/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/28/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/28/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/28/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/28/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/31/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/30/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal