judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARSA BULLOCK V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 11-CV-0469
Short Caption:MARSA BULLOCK V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB614-11Filed Date:04/11/2011

Opening Event Date:04/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/06/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/07/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarsa Bullock YPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
Carl J. SchifferleNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/27/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 11, 2011, and it ap pearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
05/06/2011RECORD COPIES
05/06/2011RECORD INDEX
05/06/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/09/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
05/09/2011RECEIVED - Motion for appeal transcript (*Filed under trial court number 01-CAB3007) (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED for 3/4/03) (elp)
05/13/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 30 days
06/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix, and appellant's statement that transcript is being prepared under CAB3007-01 for the proceeding date of March 4, 2003, and it appearing that request was denied by the trial judge, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted to the extent that appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (JAC) elp
06/17/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF W/APPENDIX
06/17/2011APPENDIX
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to correct the record
06/27/2011APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEF
06/27/2011RECEIVED - aplt's corrected brief.
07/13/2011FiledOrder Granting APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEF AND APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to correct the record (corrected appendix)
07/13/2011FiledCorrected Appendix (Appellant)
07/13/2011FiledAmended/Corrected Brief (Appellant)
07/15/2011FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellant)
08/05/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
08/08/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE/OPPO/APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE/APPELLANT'S MOTION TO SUPP RECORD/APPELLANT'S MOTION TO FILE FILE FUTURE PLEADING
08/08/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File to intervene filed by (Appellant)Denied
08/08/2011FiledOpposition to motion for Summay Affirmance. (Appellant)
09/26/2011FiledMOTION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE FUTURE PLEADING EXEMPTED FROM COURT'S BARRING ORDERDenied
10/18/2011FiledORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO INTERVENE and GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT and DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE A FUTURE PLEADING...AND
10/18/2011FiledSupplemental Appendix (Appellant)
10/18/2011FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/18/2011FiledAffirmed
10/27/2011FiledMotion To Reconsider (Appellant)Denied
11/01/2011FiledNotice Received - from aplt regarding jurisdiction (Appellant)
11/01/2011FiledTMC/MOTION TO RECONSIDER/APPELLANT'S NOTICE TO THE COURT
11/18/2011FiledORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
05/07/2012FiledMandate