judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ARTHUR C. TROILO, JR. v. CARLOS DAVIS TORRALVA

Case: B-4335
B-4335
12/07/1973
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
ARTHUR C. TROILO, JR.
CARLOS DAVIS TORRALVA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/07/1974Response to PetitionRespondent
12/31/1973Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
12/17/1973Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner
12/07/1973Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
12/07/1973Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner
12/07/1973Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/25/1974Dissenting opinion issued.
07/25/1974Opinion issued
01/07/1974Response to Petition
12/31/1973Supplemental Brief filed
12/17/1973Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/07/1973Brief in Support of Petition
12/07/1973Exhibits in case/cause filed
12/07/1973Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Arthur C. Troilo, Jr.Petitioner
Carlos Davis TorralvaRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information