judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KAHRE VS. 8TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 33601
Short Caption:KAHRE VS. 8TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33419 , 33684
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A323777Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert Kahre--US Postal M.O. No. 69820231882.
01/13/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Certiorari or Other Appropriate Writ. 99-00228
01/13/1999ExhibitFiled Exhibits (copies). Exhibit 2, Vols. 1 and 2. (Two large file folders) (Received 2 copies of each) 99-00231
01/13/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Thorndal, Backus, Armstrong & Balkenbush.
03/08/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Order Dismissing Proper Person Appeals and Denying Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Despite clear warnings, Kahre and Nelson have submitted additionald frivoulous papers, pleadings and documetns in this matter. We are compelled to take the following actions. Judgment: "We dismiss these appeals and deny this petition for a writ of mandamus." fn2 [We deny as moot petitioners' motion for a stay of enforcement of all sanctions, orders, and judgments pending our decision.] We sanction Kahre in the amount of $3,000. Kahre shall pay this sanction to the Nevada Supreme Court law Library, and shall provide poof of payment to the clerk of this court within 30 days from the date of this order. We permanently enjoin Kahre and Nelson from submitting for filing in this court any papers, pleadings or documents whatsoever in these matters. If Kahre and Nelson attempt to submit any further papers, pleadings or documents in these matters, we direct the clerk to return them to Kahre and Nelson, unfiled. fn3 [The Honorable A. William Maupin, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of these matters.] SNP99A-RR/DA/NB. Nos. 33419, 33601, 33684 (not consolidated). 99-01586
04/05/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-02509
04/05/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/28/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of certiorari was filed June 7, 1999, and placed on the docket June 21, 1999 as No. 98-2031. Nos. 33419, 33601, 33684.
10/12/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. 99-09874
12/02/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for rehearing is denied. 99-12071