judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MONICA S. CLAMAN v. JEAN M. POPP

Case Heading (S-11-0254)
Case Number:S-11-0254Case Docketed On:10/28/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:MONICA S. CLAMAN v. JEAN M. POPP
Full Title:MONICA S. CLAMAN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JEAN M. POPP, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMonica S. ClamanMichael William Stulken
AppelleeJean M. PoppLeah Kathleen Corrigan
James Kent Lubing

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Fraud
Opinion Number:2012 WY 92
Citation:279 P.3d 1003

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/28/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/28/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/09/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/12/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/26/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/30/2012Event - Hardcopy received -Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/07/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/10/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Michael Stulken obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/10/2012Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/14/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/15/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Leah Corrigan obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/27/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/27/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Exhibits; Volume IV, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/15/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Michael William Stulken for Appellant; Leah Kathleen Corrigan for Appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/15/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/27/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/13/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/13/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/19/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/17/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal